Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Guillen, Frederico, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kade, Paul Martin, against Interiors By Steven G Inc, represented by Frankel, Robert P, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Miller, Terri-Ann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMiller, Terri-Ann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Interiors By Steven G Inc |
|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Interrogs Party: Defendant Interiors By Steven G Inc |
|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Interiors By Steven G Inc |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Order/Trial Set 8-7-14 @ 1pm for 2 hours (5-12-14) |
|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing May 12, 2014 at 9:30 a.m (4-17-14) |
|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mediation Fee Payor: INTERIOR BY STEVEN G ; Userid: CTS-cdamas ; Receipt: 20134YF4A001397; omments: DEFENDANT ;Amount: $60.00 |
|
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mediation Fee Payor: FREDERICO GUILLEN ; Userid: CTS-cdamas ; Receipt: 20134YF4A001396; omments: PLAINTIFF ;Amount: $60.00 |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Mediation NOVEMBER 82013 1PM |
|
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Mediation 10/25/13 @ 12:00 pm. room120 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.