Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ingraham, William Andrew, Jr., against Argaez, Deisy C, Argaez, Freddy C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with , Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued mailed to attorney |
|
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Fee Payor: INGRAHAM, WILLIAM ; Userid: CTS-cfuerst ; Receipt: 20134YF4B002958; ;Amount: $3.00 |
|
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cert Copy Jgmt Issued to atty (by mail) |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Chapter 7 Bankruptcy as to Deisy C Argaez SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 4/10/2013 @ 3pm room 230/pltf motion for summary f/j, atty's fees |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Interest Party: Attorney Ingraham, William Andrew, Jr. |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice to (DF) of certificate of authenticityParty: Attorney Ingraham, William Andrew, Jr. |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Attorney Ingraham, William Andrew, Jr. |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of authenticity affidavit of indebtedness and documentary stamps |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney Fees and costs for summary judgmentParty: Attorney Ingraham, William Andrew, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.