Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tri County Diagnostic & Imaging Centers Llc, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Christensen, Chad, against Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Torres, Madeleine, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Mollica, Kim Theresa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
eSummons Issuance
Date: February 22, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: February 22, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: February 22, 2021Acceptance of Service
Date: March 04, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 11, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 21, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: May 21, 2021Request for Production
Date: May 21, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: May 21, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 21, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: August 18, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 25, 2021Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: July 03, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 28, 2021Response
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: September 16, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 16, 2021Agreed Order
Date: September 21, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 29, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 21, 2021Motion
Date: November 19, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: December 06, 2021Order Setting Jury Trial
Date: December 08, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: December 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Tri County Diagnostic & Imaging Centers LLC |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled on April 14, 2022, at 9:45AM |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion TO CONTINUE HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR DECEMBER 82021Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance co-counselParty: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order granting motion for extension of timeParty: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing case in law in support of pls motion for summary jgmtParty: Plaintiff Tri County Diagnostic & Imaging Centers LLC |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Plaintiff Tri County Diagnostic & Imaging Centers LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.