Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
S Viroja Pa, filed a(n) Cc Equity = $15,000 case represented by Pineres, Simon E, against Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Remy, Jason P, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with DeLuca, Steven P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCc Equity = $15,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: February 19, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: February 19, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: February 19, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: March 15, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 17, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: March 17, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 17, 2021Request for Production
Date: March 17, 2021Case Management Order
Date: January 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.