Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Accius, Cledion, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Singer, Thomas A, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Richards, John Hudson, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Barner, Florence Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Cledion Accius against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation in the County Court of Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that they had a homeowners insurance policy with the defendant, with a policy number of 00...
Expert Witness List
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: September 06, 2022Showing of Good Cause
Date: September 06, 2022Witness List
Date: September 06, 2022Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: September 09, 2022Notice of Intent
Date: October 06, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 07, 2022Response
Date: October 06, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 25, 2022Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: October 25, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 06, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: October 06, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 10, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: November 10, 2022Notice of Intent
Date: November 29, 2022Joint Motion to Continue
Date: December 12, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: December 19, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 08, 2022Response to Motion
Date: November 29, 2022Joint Stipulation
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Video Deposition
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 30, 2022Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: January 06, 2023Response to Motion
Date: January 09, 2023Agreed Order Granting
Date: January 10, 2023Order Denying Motion
Date: January 27, 2023Notice of Mediation
Date: March 20, 2023Order Setting Jury Trial
Date: January 30, 2023Affidavit in Support of Motion
Date: February 03, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: March 29, 2023Certificate
Date: March 22, 2023Joint Stipulation
Date: March 29, 2023Request to Produce
Date: February 19, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: February 19, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: February 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation JOINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF AGREED STIPULATION REGARDING MEDIATIONParty: Plaintiff Accius, Cledion Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.720Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support of Motion | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial CALENDAR CALL; MARCH 17, 2023 AT 9:30AM VIA ZOOM |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Granting THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION AS TO TIMING OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Motion | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION AS TO TIMING OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND FACTUAL SUPPORT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDAN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.