Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ally Bank, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Palma, Jorge L, Esq., against Guzman, Julian D, represented by Singer, Jonathan Robert, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Benson, Betsy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Ally Bank against Julian D Guzman. The complaint states that Julian D Guzman entered into a Retail Installment Sale Contract with Ally Bank, but defaulted on the obligation to make payments due under the contract. Ally Bank...
Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: January 02, 2018Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: April 15, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 02, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 10, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: February 06, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: February 06, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: April 15, 2018Notice of Service
Date: September 03, 2020Affidavit of Costs
Date: April 15, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: April 15, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: August 17, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: August 15, 2023Notice of Service
Date: December 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance FOR POST-JUDGMENT COLLECTIONSParty: Plaintiff Ally Bank |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Ally Bank |
|
April 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing AFFIDAVITParty: Plaintiff Ally Bank |
|
April 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Costs Party: Plaintiff Ally Bank |
|
April 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit SUPPLEMENTALParty: Defendant Guzman, Julian D |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default Party: Plaintiff Ally Bank |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVITParty: Plaintiff Ally Bank |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.