Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
All Hours Emergency Water Removal Inc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Buchanan, Jayme Michelle, against Scottsdale Indemnity Company, represented by Kelley, Michael Francis, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Miranda, Giuseppina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMiranda, Giuseppina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Corporate Representative With Most Knowledge |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff All Hours Emergency Water Removal Inc |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Vacation From 8-2-13 through 8-12-13Party: Defendant Scottsdale Indemnity Company |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Scottsdale Indemnity Company |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01/24/13Party: Defendant Scottsdale Indemnity Company |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit Of Service With Original SummonsParty: Plaintiff All Hours Emergency Water Removal Inc |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: BUCHANAN, JAYME MICHELLE ; Userid: CTS-aneal ; Receipt: 20131YF1S000048; ;Amount: $300.00 |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued to Attorney (mail) |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: BUCHANAN, JAYME MICHELLE ; Userid: CTS-aneal ; Receipt: 20131YF1S000048; ;Amount: $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.