Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cannatelli Builders Inc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Taylor, Kevin J, Esq., against Super Cool Inc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Miranda, Giuseppina presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2013 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on PL Motion for Court Default - Granted. DF shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtai counsel and respond to the Complaint. Failure to do so will result in a Default Judgment being entred. (1/30/13) |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 1-30-13 @ 10:45 Rm 359 Re-Motion for Default |
|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff Cannatelli Builders Inc |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff Cannatelli Builders Inc |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/04/12Party: Defendant Super Cool Inc |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: TAYLOR ESQ, KEVIN J ; Userid: CTS-scallenius ; Receipt: 20121YF1A008653; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: TAYLOR ESQ, KEVIN J ; Userid: CTS-scallenius ; Receipt: 20121YF1A008653; ;Amount: $300.00 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued to Process Server Party: Defendant Super Cool Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.