Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hillsboro Physician Partners, Llc, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Jenkins, Chase, Esq., against West Boca Vascular Surgery, P.A., represented by Gil, Francis R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2023 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Motion for Disqualification
Date: June 29, 2023Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 29, 2023Amended Complaint
Date: July 26, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: June 29, 2023Motion to Stay
Date: August 07, 2023eSummons Issuance
Date: May 31, 2023Response
Date: September 20, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 14, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: August 14, 2023Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 25, 2023Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Party: Plaintiff HILLSBORO PHYSICIAN PARTNERS, LLC |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Defendant WEST BOCA VASCULAR SURGERY, P.A. |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay Party: Defendant WEST BOCA VASCULAR SURGERY, P.A. |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Disqualification Party: Defendant WEST BOCA VASCULAR SURGERY, P.A. |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant WEST BOCA VASCULAR SURGERY, P.A. |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant WEST BOCA VASCULAR SURGERY, P.A. |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance WEST BOCA VASCULAR SURGERY, P.A |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.