Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Westview Condominium Association No. Two, Inc., filed a(n) 3 case represented by Mulrey, Tara Nicole, against Michael, Lina, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 26, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: October 14, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 26, 2022Summons Returned Unserved
Date: October 14, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 04, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 15, 2022Non-Military Affidavit
Date: December 15, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: January 16, 2023Motion for Default
Date: December 15, 2022Case Management Order
Date: January 19, 2023Order Granting Default
Date: February 07, 2023Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: February 13, 2023Affidavit
Date: February 13, 2023Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: February 13, 2023Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: February 15, 2023Affidavit
Date: February 16, 2023Certificate of Service
Date: March 13, 2023Report of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: June 09, 2023Order Resetting
Date: May 22, 2023Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 31, 2023Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 06, 2023Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: February 21, 2023Case Management Order
Date: March 14, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: May 19, 2023Order Deferring
Date: April 06, 2023Amended Affidavit
Date: June 28, 2023Amended Affidavit
Date: June 28, 2023Amended Affidavit
Date: June 29, 2023Amended Affidavit
Date: June 28, 2023Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: June 29, 2023Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: August 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference https://17thflcourts.zoom.us/j/111475745 of the Broward County Courthouse, 201 SE 6th , 09-28-2023 39:15 am . |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEESParty: Plaintiff Westview Condominium Association No. Two, Inc. |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference on 08-29-2023 9:15 AM |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit OF ATTORNEYS' FEESParty: Plaintiff Westview Condominium Association No. Two, Inc. |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit OF LIEN FEES AND COSTSParty: Plaintiff Westview Condominium Association No. Two, Inc. |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit OF INDEBTEDNESS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSUREParty: Plaintiff Westview Condominium Association No. Two, Inc. |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report of Guardian Ad Litem Party: Defendant Michael, Lina |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 06-29-2023 at 8:45 am rm 16170 or Zoom |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 06-26-2023 9:15 AM |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting CMC FOR 06-29-2023 @ 9:15AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.