Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brooks, Valerie, filed a(n) case represented by Chisholm, Michael E, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Poterek, Daniel J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Appearance
Date: October 10, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: October 12, 2022Request for Production
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: November 18, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 30, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 10, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: October 10, 2022Answer to Complaint
Date: October 25, 2022Reply
Date: October 26, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 24, 2022Request to Produce
Date: October 10, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: July 20, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 20, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 20, 2023Subpoena Returned Served
Date: July 25, 2023Notice of Mediation
Date: July 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served SERVED ALLIE VALERO ON JULY 24th 2023 |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued By Attorney Allie Valero |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Allie Valero |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served TRAVIA BALDEO FIVE STAR CLAIMS ADJUSTING |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply Party: Plaintiff Brooks, Valerie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.