Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lrf1 Crossroads Square, Llc, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Estes, Theodore, against Islands In The Pines Restaurant, Llc, Russell, Audley, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 27, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 27, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 27, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 27, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: October 19, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: October 19, 2022Motion for Default & Default
Date: October 21, 2022Affidavit in Support of Motion
Date: November 14, 2022eWrit Issuance - Possession
Date: November 21, 2022Motion for Final Judgment
Date: November 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | eWrit Issuance - Possession | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support of Motion | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment OF EVICTION AFTER DEFAULTParty: Plaintiff LRF1 Crossroads Square, LLC |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default against Defendant, ISLANDS IN THE PINES RESTAURANT, LLCParty: Plaintiff LRF1 Crossroads Square, LLC |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served on Island In The Pines Restaurant, LLC; 10/5/2022 @ 10:20 am |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served on Audley Russell; 10/5/2022 @ 10:20 am |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Russell, Audley |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Islands In The Pines Restaurant, LLC |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance 5 Day SummonsParty: Defendant Russell, Audley |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance 5 Day SummonsParty: Defendant Islands In The Pines Restaurant, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.