Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Guner, Can, Esq., against Chapman, Susan, Griffin, Gilbert, Griffin, Tonie M, Griffith, George Alonso, Sr., represented by Lampariello, Nicolas, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Garcia-Wood, Marina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia-Wood, Marina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/> $250K |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This is a complaint for foreclosure filed in the state of Florida. The plaintiff, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, seeks to foreclose on a mortgage given by the defendant, Maria C. Goncalves, on the property located at 618 SW 133 Terrace, Port S...
Final Judgment of Foreclosure
Date: November 08, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022Certificate
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: September 23, 2022Value Claim Form
Date: September 23, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: October 11, 2022Summons Returned Unserved
Date: October 11, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: November 03, 2022Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: October 24, 2022Affidavit for Service by Publication
Date: October 24, 2022Affidavit
Date: November 18, 2022Notice of Action
Date: November 03, 2022eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: January 06, 2023Proof of Publication
Date: December 02, 2022eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: January 06, 2023eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: January 06, 2023eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: January 06, 2023Certificate
Date: January 06, 2023Summons Returned Served
Date: February 28, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: January 06, 2023Amended Complaint
Date: January 06, 2023Summons Returned Served
Date: February 28, 2023Proof of Service
Date: August 02, 2023Proof of Service
Date: August 02, 2023Proof of Service
Date: August 02, 2023Proof of Service
Date: August 02, 2023Affidavit
Date: August 02, 2023Default
Date: August 02, 2023Motion for Default
Date: August 02, 2023Notice
Date: August 17, 2023Notice of Readiness for Trial
Date: August 10, 2023Notice of Intent
Date: August 10, 2023Order Setting
Date: August 15, 2023Witness & Exhibit List
Date: August 24, 2023Witness & Exhibit List
Date: August 31, 2023Notice of Intent
Date: August 31, 2023Non-Military Affidavit
Date: September 28, 2023Notice of Non Jury Trial
Date: October 04, 2023Order Setting
Date: September 29, 2023Certificate of Service
Date: October 04, 2023Witness & Exhibit List
Date: October 06, 2023Non-Military Affidavit
Date: October 13, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: October 24, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: October 24, 2023Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage
Date: October 25, 2023Certificate of Service
Date: November 09, 2023Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: January 16, 2024Proof of Publication
Date: February 01, 2024Notice of Appearance
Date: February 05, 2024Motion to Strike
Date: February 06, 2024Motion to File
Date: February 07, 2024Bid Sheet
Date: February 07, 2024Certificate of Sale
Date: February 07, 2024Affidavit
Date: February 07, 2024Certificate of Title
Date: February 20, 2024Certificate of Disbursements
Date: February 20, 2024Motion for Writ of Possession
Date: February 28, 2024Notice of Appearance
Date: February 28, 2024Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: August 15, 2023Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: September 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ of Possession Third Party Purchaser, PAGARMI, LLC |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Marisel Pinero-Alhadeff, Esq. Florida Bar No. 95206 for Bidder, PARGAMI, LLC |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Emailed | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to File PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.