Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cardinal Financial Company Limited Partnership, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Anthousis, Julie, Esq., against Felix Quijada, Jose, Lakeshore Club Homeowners Association Inc, Leganik, Andrew G, Marie Leganik, Ann, Marie Quijada, Connie, (total of 9) See All represented by Segaul, John David, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Garcia-Wood, Marina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia-Wood, Marina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: August 04, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 10, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 10, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 10, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 10, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 10, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 10, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 10, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: August 31, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 10, 2022Response
Date: August 26, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: August 31, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 10, 2022Response
Date: August 26, 2022Answer to Complaint
Date: August 31, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: August 31, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: August 31, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: August 31, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: August 31, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: August 31, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: August 31, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: August 31, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: October 28, 2022Order Granting
Date: September 21, 2022Motion for Default
Date: October 27, 2022Notice
Date: November 03, 2022Notice of Service
Date: October 27, 2022Order Extending Time
Date: October 31, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 21, 2022Memo
Date: October 31, 2022Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: November 11, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: December 19, 2022Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 17, 2023Order Denying Motion
Date: January 23, 2023Final Disposition Form
Date: April 07, 2023Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: August 04, 2022Motion to Correct Scriveners Error
Date: August 04, 2022Lis Pendens
Date: August 04, 2022Value Claim Form
Date: August 04, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 04, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Pursuant to Settlement - Before Hearing |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO FORECLOSURE COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Michell, Krystal Alize |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion TO DISMISS |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Michell, Krystal Alize |
|
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Complaint TO ADD PARTY DEFENDANTSParty: Plaintiff Cardinal Financial Company Limited Partnership |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SERVINGParty: Plaintiff Cardinal Financial Company Limited Partnership |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM AS TO LAKESHORE CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSEParty: Plaintiff Cardinal Financial Company Limited Partnership |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.