Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Schwitzke, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Di Stefano, Robert, against Graves, Tiffany M, represented by Hauf, Julie Lewis, Esq., Obianagu, Chuka, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrink, Keathan B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by David Schwitzke against Tiffany M. Graves in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $30,000, excluding interest, attorney's fees, and costs. David...
Notice of Mediation
Date: January 16, 2023Witness List
Date: December 07, 2022Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: January 03, 2023Certificate
Date: January 18, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: February 27, 2023Witness List
Date: January 19, 2023Request for Copies
Date: January 23, 2023Mediation Report
Date: February 28, 2023eSummons Issuance
Date: August 31, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 31, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 31, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 01, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: September 23, 2021Answer to Complaint
Date: October 13, 2021Request for Production
Date: October 13, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 13, 2021Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: October 14, 2021Request to Produce
Date: October 14, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: October 14, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 21, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 10, 2022Subpoena Filed
Date: January 14, 2022Subpoena Filed
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2022Case Management Order
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITYParty: Defendant Graves, Tiffany M |
|
January 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Expert Witness | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.