Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Myp Executive Llc, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Lindeman, Robert J, Marcadis, Ralph S, Esq., against Callejas, Mario, Capital Health Advisors Inc, represented by Wolfe, Mason Richard, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: August 31, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 31, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 31, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 31, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: December 06, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 01, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: September 07, 2021Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: December 06, 2021Non-Military Affidavit
Date: December 06, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 17, 2021Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 22, 2021Motion
Date: December 22, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 03, 2022Agreed Order Granting
Date: February 05, 2022Case Management Order
Date: February 11, 2022Order Referring Case to Mediation
Date: April 05, 2022Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: April 05, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: June 10, 2022Notice Setting Mediation
Date: June 29, 2022Interrogatories
Date: July 19, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: July 19, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 19, 2022Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: August 24, 2022Notice
Date: July 19, 2022Request for Production
Date: July 19, 2022Notice
Date: August 24, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 24, 2022Mediation Report
Date: September 14, 2022Settlement Agreement
Date: September 14, 2022Certificate
Date: August 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate FOR MEDIATION PURSUANT TO FLA.R.CIV.P. 1.720Party: Plaintiff Myp Executive LLC |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTEDParty: Plaintiff Myp Executive LLC |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories TO THE DEFENDANTParty: Plaintiff Myp Executive LLC |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Myp Executive LLC |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Plaintiff Myp Executive LLC |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONSParty: Plaintiff Myp Executive LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.