Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vunkannon Roberts, Lisa, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Ricci, Edward V, against Game, Maria Belen, Maria Belen Game Md, Pronto Urgent Care Llc, represented by Lynn, Jonathon P, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Olefson, Shari Africk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOlefson, Shari Africk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Response to Request for Production
Date: May 05, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 05, 2022Case Management Order
Date: July 08, 2022Notice of Interrogatories
Date: October 05, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 31, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 01, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: September 13, 2021Request for Production
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Interrogatories
Date: October 05, 2021Acceptance of Service
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Interrogatories
Date: October 05, 2021Answer to Complaint
Date: October 04, 2021Notice of Interrogatories
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 09, 2021Interrogatories
Date: January 28, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: November 18, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 16, 2021Case Management Order
Date: January 06, 2022Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 18, 2021Request for Production
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Video Deposition
Date: March 18, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 04, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Video Deposition | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline 01-12-2023 at 10:00 AM |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Interrogatories | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.