Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Romani, Amy, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Schilling, Tawna S, against 1995 Bayview, Llc, Elevator Service Corporation, Palermo 30, Llc, Rmk Ventures Llc, Solutions Pm Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Cuneo, Frank P, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaury, William W., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint was filed by Amy Romani against defendants 1995 Bayview, LLC, Palermo 30, LLC, and Solutions RE LLC in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on or about December 12, 2019,...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 31, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: September 01, 2021eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised
Date: August 31, 2021eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised
Date: September 01, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 31, 2021eSummons Issuance (No Fee)
Date: September 13, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 01, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: September 13, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 17, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: December 21, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: December 21, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: January 12, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: January 12, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: January 12, 2022Motion for Default
Date: February 15, 2022Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: February 20, 2023Motion for Default & Default
Date: April 22, 2022Notice of Withdrawal
Date: April 22, 2022Motion for Default & Default
Date: April 22, 2022Motion for Default & Default
Date: April 22, 2022Motion to Vacate Default
Date: August 02, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: July 14, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: August 02, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 01, 2023Motion to Vacate Default
Date: July 18, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: July 28, 2023Motion to Vacate Default
Date: August 08, 2023Order Vacating Default
Date: August 08, 2023Amended Complaint
Date: September 08, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: August 24, 2023eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: September 22, 2023eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: September 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - On Amended Party: Defendant RMK Ventures Llc |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - On Amended ELEVATOR SERVICE CORPORATION |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff Romani, Amy |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Law Offices of Scott L. AstrinParty: Defendant 1995 Bayview, LLC Defendant Solutions Re LLC Defendant Palermo 30, LLC |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Default VERIFIED AMENDED MOTION TO VACATE CLERK'S DEFAULT AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINL JUDGMENTParty: Defendant Solutions Re LLC |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Vacating Default | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Default VERIFIEDParty: Defendant 1995 Bayview, LLC Defendant Palermo 30, LLC |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 2:15pm Tuesday, August 8th, 2023 |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Default Party: Defendant Solutions Re LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.