Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cannis, Jerry, Cannis, Peggy, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Santiago, Maximo A, Santiago, Maximo Alexander, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Mata, Hipolita T, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Garcia-Wood, Marina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia-Wood, Marina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Request for Production of Documents
Date: August 31, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 31, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: August 31, 2021Interrogatories
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 27, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 31, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Service
Date: October 01, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 27, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 05, 2021Motion to Stay
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: March 30, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 28, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 16, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: May 24, 2022Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 19, 2022Request for Production
Date: May 24, 2022Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: May 24, 2022Answer & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: June 10, 2022Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: June 07, 2022Notice
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: June 22, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 28, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: June 30, 2022Expert Interrogatories
Date: September 23, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 25, 2022Order of Reassignment
Date: February 09, 2023Request for Production
Date: September 23, 2022Mediation Report
Date: November 19, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: March 31, 2023Witness & Exhibit List
Date: January 20, 2023Witness List
Date: November 23, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: April 19, 2023Motion for Rehearing
Date: May 24, 2023Motion
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: June 05, 2023Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 31, 2023Case Management Order
Date: August 10, 2023Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: August 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline CALENDAR CALL: 03-21-2024 at 10:30 AM |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Mandatory CMC on 08-28-2023 at 1:30 pm via Zoom |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Rehearing Party: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Reassignment FROM DIV 09 TO DIV 22 |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.