Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Best Global Partners, Llc, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Hirzel, Leon F, against De La Roca, Daniel Mila, Marquez, Marisela Torres, Romero, Jorge, represented by Ortega, Omar, Esq., Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Best Global Partners, LLC (BGP), a Florida limited liability company, against defendants Daniel Mila de la Roca, Jorge Romero, and Marisela Torres Marquez. The complaint alleges breach of fiduciary duties, tortious interfer...
eSummons Issuance
Date: May 19, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 19, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 19, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 19, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 19, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: May 20, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: June 03, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 18, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: July 15, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: June 22, 2021Motion for Disqualification
Date: July 16, 2021Notice of Status Conference Set
Date: July 28, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 06, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 13, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 06, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 06, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 07, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 26, 2021Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: October 15, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: November 05, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Service
Date: November 05, 2021Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part
Date: November 09, 2021Motion
Date: November 17, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 18, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 18, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 01, 2021Amended Motion
Date: December 03, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 15, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: December 15, 2021Request for Production
Date: December 23, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: December 29, 2021Notice of Service
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: January 03, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: January 17, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: January 19, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: January 21, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 21, 2022Order Denying
Date: January 25, 2022Order Compelling Discovery
Date: January 25, 2022Response to Motion
Date: January 28, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 26, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Service
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: February 08, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 27, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: June 03, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: July 05, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: July 25, 2022Order Denying Motion
Date: July 14, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 26, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 27, 2022Notice of Appeal
Date: August 05, 2022Motion to Stay
Date: August 05, 2022Acknowledgment
Date: August 09, 20224th DCA Order
Date: August 09, 2022Order Granting Motion to Stay
Date: August 16, 2022Order Extending Time
Date: August 16, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: January 23, 2023Order Denying Motion
Date: August 19, 2022Answer to Complaint
Date: March 24, 2023Order Vacating
Date: March 27, 2023Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: March 31, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 24, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 26, 2023Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 19, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: July 14, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 23, 2023Motion to Withdraw
Date: July 27, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: August 04, 2023Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: August 16, 2023Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: August 16, 2023Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: August 24, 2023Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: August 25, 2023Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: August 25, 2023Copy of Correspondence
Date: September 01, 2023Motion for Default
Date: September 07, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: September 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Pro-Se NoticeParty: Defendant Marquez, Marisela Torres |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Copy of Correspondence letteParty: Defendant Romero, Jorge |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued By Attorney TO: Valley National Bank |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena Issued By Attorney | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Case No. 23-16713 -PDRParty: Defendant De La Roca, Daniel Mila |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Withdraw | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Compel | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTSParty: Defendant De La Roca, Daniel Mila Defendant Romero, Jorge Defendant Marquez, Marisela Torres |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.