Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Payan, Heriberto, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Fetherhuff, Brenda Sue, against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, represented by Goldman, Hailey A, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Interrogatories
Date: May 12, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 12, 2021Request for Production
Date: May 12, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: May 14, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: May 12, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: June 25, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 12, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 12, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 09, 2021Request to Produce
Date: July 29, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: May 25, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: June 14, 2021Motion to Stay
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 14, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 09, 2021Order Granting Motion to Stay
Date: July 14, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 29, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 21, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 02, 2021Privilege Log
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 04, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: August 06, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 03, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 27, 2021Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part
Date: August 20, 2021Notice of Service
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 01, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: September 09, 2021Request for Copies
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 10, 2021Notice
Date: September 29, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 16, 2021Objection
Date: October 19, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 20, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 06, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: August 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Objection NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ENTERING UPON LANDParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.