Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cline, Lourdes M., Cline, Todd G., filed a(n) Other case represented by Powell, Norman Christopher, against City Of Fort Lauderdale, represented by Dion, Edward A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Todd G. Cline and Lourdes M. Cline against the City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. The plaintiffs allege that the City's Public Works Department improperly removed a protective traffic safety guardrail that was installed by t...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 12, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: May 20, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: May 18, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 28, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 12, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 14, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 12, 2021Opposition
Date: July 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEFParty: Defendant City of Fort Lauderdale |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant City of Fort Lauderdale |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 18th day of May, 2021Party: Defendant City of Fort Lauderdale |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance City of FortLauderda\e |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Cline, Todd G. Plaintiff Cline, Lourdes M. |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.