Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fuentes, Andrea, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Moreau, Lucas T, against Geico Indemnity Company, represented by Brust, Steven E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Olefson, Shari Africk presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff Andrea Fuentes against Defendant GEICO Indemnity Company. The complaint alleges that on June 30, 2018, the plaintiff was involved in a motor vehicle accident caused by Breion Brown, who ran a red light and fled th...
Notice of Non Objection to Production
Date: October 24, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: November 23, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 20, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: October 31, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: May 07, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 07, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 07, 2021Request to Produce
Date: May 07, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 07, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 07, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 10, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: May 18, 2021Motion to Transfer
Date: June 10, 2021Request to Produce
Date: June 10, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 10, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 30, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 28, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 14, 2021Response to Request to Produce
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 27, 2021Agreed Order
Date: August 03, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 13, 2021Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part
Date: October 01, 2021Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 11, 2021Case Management Order
Date: October 14, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 25, 2021Answer to Complaint
Date: October 11, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 04, 2021Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: November 08, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: November 18, 2021Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: November 05, 2021Joint Stipulation
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Case Transfer
Date: March 17, 2022Complete File Received
Date: March 25, 2022Motion to Bifurcate
Date: March 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Non Objection to Production | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Bifurcate COVERAGE FROM TORT LIABILITY AND TO TRY COVERAGE FIRSTParty: Defendant Geico Indemnity Company |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Complete File Received | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Transfer to DLLMAL-CQUNIY-on 03/17/22 |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Don't Docket On This Case | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Comment: RCVD TRANSFER PYMT-CHECK NO.017787 $401 BY DEF'S ATY-BRUST |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Comment: EMAILED TRANSFER FEE LETTER TO DEF'S ATY-BRUST F/U ON 4/1/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.