Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alters, Jeremy, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Stallone, Joseph F, against Event Options, Inc., H.J.J., Inc.,, J.H.J. Holdings, Inc., represented by Goldberg, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Olefson, Shari Africk presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryConfirm Arbitration Award |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: April 26, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: June 04, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: April 27, 2021Petition (eFiled)
Date: April 26, 2021Certificate of Compliance
Date: April 27, 2021Response
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 16, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: April 27, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: April 27, 2021Response
Date: May 20, 2021Notice
Date: February 18, 2022Order to Compel
Date: July 18, 2021Motion
Date: July 31, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: January 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CON FIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND MOION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENTParty: Defendant H.J.J., Inc., |
|
July 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of arbitration 06/22/2022 @10:00 am |
|
July 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Compel PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION /GRANTED |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response TO PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATIONParty: Defendant J.H.J. Holdings, Inc. |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff Alters, Jeremy |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response TO PETITIONER'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATIONParty: Defendant H.J.J., Inc., |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance J.H.J. HOLDINGS, INC |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.