Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Airbnb, Inc, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Abuyounis, Jafar M., against Siegel, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryConfirm Arbitration Award |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
This complaint is a Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Airbnb, Inc. against Michael Siegel in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The petitioner, Airbnb, is seeking confirmation of an arbitration awa...
Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: March 12, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: March 11, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: April 06, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: March 18, 2021Stipulation
Date: April 02, 2021Petition (eFiled)
Date: March 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 03/31/2021Party: Defendant Siegel, Michael |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation CONFIRMING AIRBNB'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARDParty: Plaintiff Airbnb, Inc |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance MICHAEL SIEGEL |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO none |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | No Summons Issued | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition (eFiled) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAWParty: Plaintiff Airbnb, Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.