Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Plywood And Lumbersales, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cook, David J, against Raymond David Huerta, Sierra Cabinets, Inc., represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions53 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time121 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION AS TO SIERRA CABINETS, INC. - Minutes DROPPED BY COURT |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION AS TO RAYMOND DAVID HUERTA - Minutes DROPPED BY COURT |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT OF RIGHTS, RESTRAINING & TURNOVER ORDER FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
SIGNED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT OF RIG HTS (HEARD 7/12/10) SENT TO RM103 FOR FILING Not Applicable |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR ASSIGNMENT OF RIGHTS, RESTRAINING & TURNOVER ORDER FILED BY PLYWOOD AND LUMBERSALES, INC. - Minutes GRANTED |
|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FLING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: MOT FOR ASSIGNMENT OF RIGHTS, RESTRAIN & TURNOVER ORDER ON 6/8/10 TO LISTED PARTIES Not Applicable |
|
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION FOR SIERRA CABINETS, INC. FILED. Not Applicable |
|
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF DAVID J COOK FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT OF RIGHTS, RESTRAINING & TURNOVER ORDER Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.