Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Edmond, Marie, Feder Edmond, Jean, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Borshchukov, Vyacheslav, Esq., against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Comany,, represented by Qiu, Mengjun "Kristy", in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Casey, Daniel A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is a petition for declaratory relief filed by Jean Feder Edmond and Marie Edmond against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The petitioners are seeking a declaration of their rights under a property insurance policy for...
Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 20, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: February 20, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 01, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: February 20, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: February 20, 2021Request for Production
Date: February 20, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: February 20, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 16, 2021Motion for Default
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: April 05, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Jury Trial
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: July 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Comany, |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Trial Party: Plaintiff Feder Edmond, Jean Plaintiff Edmond, Marie |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Comany, |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default BY THE COURTParty: Plaintiff Feder Edmond, Jean Plaintiff Edmond, Marie |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Comany, |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPONDParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Comany, |
|
February 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
February 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR DECLARATORY RELIEFParty: Plaintiff Feder Edmond, Jean Plaintiff Edmond, Marie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.