Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nav-X, Llc, filed a(n) Other case represented by Mena, Daniel O, against Roque, Rigoberto, represented by Avila, Jose Alfredo, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Lopane, Nicholas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by NAV-X, LLC against Rigoberto Roque for damages. The complaint alleges that Roque, who is a member and manager of the company, unlawfully retained certain monies paid to him by the company. The company has made multiple dema...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2020Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: January 04, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 04, 2021Stipulation
Date: March 12, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 04, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: February 02, 2021Waiver of Service of Process
Date: January 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND TO ENTRY OF AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSALParty: Defendant Roque, Rigoberto Plaintiff NAV-X, LLC |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NAV-X, LLC'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Roque, Rigoberto |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served January 28, 2021 at 12:10pmParty: Defendant Roque, Rigoberto |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service of Process Party: Defendant Roque, Rigoberto |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance RIGOBERTO ROQUE |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) For DamagesParty: Plaintiff NAV-X LLC |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet Amount: $50,001.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.