Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Backman, Honey, Backman, Scott, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Aragon, Yemil, Esq., against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Winkler, Kathryn M., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Scott Backman and Honey Backman against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract and seek damages exceeding $30,000. The plaintiffs own a property in Broward Co...
Request for Production of Documents
Date: December 31, 2020Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: January 04, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2020Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process
Date: January 12, 2021Request for Production
Date: February 01, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: January 19, 2021Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: February 01, 2021Request
Date: February 01, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: February 03, 2021Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: February 25, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 16, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: March 29, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 25, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 05, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 09, 2022Privilege Log
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: February 15, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: March 07, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 24, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: December 31, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2020Response to Request to Produce
Date: February 25, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: February 25, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: April 16, 2021Privilege Log
Date: February 25, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: December 31, 2020Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 01, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 25, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 16, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 20, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served SERVED AHMED SHIKLEY ON FEBRUARY 17TH 2022 |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance FOR NON-PARTY CMR CONSTRUCTION & ROOFING, LLC |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.