Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Konick, Melissa, Esq., against Foster , Althea, Foster, Colwyn, Preferred Credit, Inc.,, represented by Hetfeld, Ben R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for IndyMac IMSC Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-F3, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-F3, against Colwyn Foster, Althea Foster, and Preferred Cred...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2020Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: December 31, 2020Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: January 04, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: March 10, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: March 10, 2021Notice of Firm Name Change
Date: January 26, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: March 10, 2021Notice of Action
Date: April 08, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: May 10, 2021Default
Date: May 18, 2021Motion for Default
Date: May 18, 2021Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: July 16, 2021Notice of Non Jury Trial
Date: June 03, 2021Certificate of Service
Date: September 08, 2021Amended Witness List
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: October 14, 2021Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: October 18, 2021Certificate
Date: December 31, 2020Proof of Service
Date: May 18, 2021Notice of Intent
Date: May 20, 2021Affidavit of Proof of Publication
Date: July 27, 2021Notice
Date: September 23, 2021Affidavit of Costs
Date: October 11, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2020Value Claim Form
Date: December 31, 2020Affidavit for Service by Publication
Date: April 08, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: April 08, 2021Notice of Readiness for Trial
Date: May 20, 2021Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: June 01, 2021Witness & Exhibit List
Date: September 08, 2021Notice of Intent
Date: September 08, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: October 11, 2021Order Placing Case on Inactive Status
Date: October 19, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: January 11, 2022Answer to Complaint
Date: May 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Comment: File created and Original Note placed in the file |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Placing Case on Inactive Status | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Case Number: 21-19973-PDRParty: Defendant Foster, Colwyn |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Original NoteParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Witness List | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ZOOM INSTRUCTION FOR NON-JURY TRIAL DATE ON OCTOBER 19, 2021 @ 9:00 AMParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.