Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Friedman Dc, Pa, Eric G., filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Barr, Chad, against Progressive American Insurance Company, represented by Girardi, Dana J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Judge AP, Appeals presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge AP, Appeals Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2020 |
CategoryAppeal (County Court) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
4th DCA Order
Date: May 12, 20214th DCA Order
Date: January 27, 20214th DCA Order
Date: April 19, 2021Acknowledgment
Date: January 04, 2021Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal
Date: December 29, 2020Pre-billed Appellant pending payment of:
Date: January 04, 2021Order
Date: January 07, 2021Order
Date: January 10, 2021Acknowledgment
Date: January 26, 2021Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of:
Date: February 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order ORDERED that appellants' February 2, 2021 motion for award of appellate attorney's fees is granted cnditioned on the trial court determining that appellants are the prevailing party and, if so, settig the amount of the attorney's fees to be awarded for this appellate case. If a motion for rehearin is filed in this court, then services rendered in connection with the filing of the motion, includng but not limited to preparation of a responsive pleading, shall be taken into account in computin the amount of the fee. Further, ORDERED that the motion for costs filed by Chad A. Barr is denied ithout prejudice to seek costs in the trial court |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order ORDERED that appellant's March 8, 2021 motion to consolidate is granted, and case numbers 4D21-0568,4D21-0569, 4D21-0570, 4D21-0580, 4D21-0581, 4D21-0588, 4D21- 0589, 4D21-0590, 4D21-0591, 4D21-0593,4D21-0595, 4D21-0596, and 4D21-0646 are now consolidated for all purposes and are to proceed under he time schedule for a nonfinal appeal and according to the requirements of Florida Rule of Appellae Procedure 9.130, and shall proceed under case number 4D21-0568 |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of: | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D21-0569/ Upon consideration 4f the clerk of the lower tribunal's notification that appellant(s) di not pay the filing fee or obtain a waiver of the filing fee before this case was transferred from |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment 4D21-0569 |
|
January 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order SECOND AMENDED TRANSFER OF PENDING APPEALS FROM THE 17TH CIRCUIT |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (AMENDED) TRANSFER OF PENDING APPEALS FROM THE 17TH CIRCUIT |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-billed Appellant pending payment of: | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal JS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.