Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capera, Damian, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Militzok, Matthew J, against Boardwalk At Bizcaya Condominium Association, represented by Bogert, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSinger, Michele Towbin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryCondominium Action |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
This complaint was filed by Damian Capera against the Boardwalk at Vizcaya Condominium Association, Inc. The plaintiff alleges breach of contract and violations of Chapter 718 of the Florida Statutes. The plaintiff seeks compensatory damages, injunct...
Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 31, 2021Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 10, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: January 05, 2021Request for Production
Date: May 25, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 25, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: June 01, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 01, 2021Request for Production
Date: March 31, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 24, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: July 01, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: February 01, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: July 02, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 31, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 14, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 24, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: January 15, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: April 30, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 06, 2022Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: January 07, 2022Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: September 01, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: November 09, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: January 12, 2022Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: October 01, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: August 02, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 01, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: December 16, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: January 20, 2022Witness List
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: January 12, 2022Order Extending Time
Date: January 12, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: January 13, 2022Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 04, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: July 07, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 08, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: November 30, 2021Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: January 09, 2022Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: January 05, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: December 14, 2020Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time DEFT /GRANTED |
|
January 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline 06-02-2022 at 10:00 AM |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Boardwalk at Bizcaya Condominium Association |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.