Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tabib, Christian, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kline, Jonathan Harris, against Cinemark Concessions, Llc, Cinemark Holdings, Inc., Cinemark Usa, Inc., represented by Studley, Rachel, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 10, 2020Request to Produce
Date: April 14, 2020Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 10, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 10, 2020Request for Admissions
Date: April 14, 2020Notice of Interrogatories
Date: April 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY REQUESTSParty: Plaintiff Tabib, Christian |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff Tabib, Christian |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Cinemark USA, Inc. |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories Party: Defendant Cinemark USA, Inc. |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Cinemark Concessions, Llc |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Cinemark USA, Inc. |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Cinemark Holdings, Inc. |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Rachel Studley, FBN 0578088Party: Defendant Cinemark USA, Inc. Defendant Cinemark Holdings, Inc. Defendant Cinemark Concessions, Llc |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 15th day of January, 2020Party: Defendant Cinemark Concessions, Llc |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 15th day of January, 2020Party: Defendant Cinemark Holdings, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.