Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Partners For Payment Relief De Iv Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Garcia Gilbert, Michelle, against Antigua At Pembroke Falls Homeowners Association I, Lopez, Victoria, Marty, Damarys, Marty, Juan, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Garcia-Wood, Marina presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Partners for Payment Relief IV LLC has filed a complaint for foreclosure of mortgage, reformation of mortgage and reformation of warranty deed. The plaintiff is seeking to foreclose on the mortgage due to default on payments. The plaintiff is also se...
eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2019Notice of Dropping Party(S)
Date: June 30, 2020Order Vacating Judgment
Date: May 28, 2021Final Judgment of Foreclosure
Date: March 29, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: December 31, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: December 31, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: December 31, 2019Value Claim Form
Date: December 31, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: January 11, 2020Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 15, 2020Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: January 13, 2020Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 15, 2020Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 15, 2020Affidavit of Service
Date: January 15, 2020Affidavit of Service
Date: January 15, 2020Affidavit of Service
Date: January 15, 2020Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted
Date: July 14, 2020Summons Returned Served
Date: August 31, 2020Affidavit in Support
Date: September 22, 2020Affidavit of Costs
Date: September 22, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 22, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: September 29, 2020eSummons Issuance - Pluries
Date: October 07, 2020Verified Statement of Compliance with the CARES Act
Date: October 08, 2020Verified Statement of Compliance with the CARES Act
Date: October 15, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 15, 2020Summons Returned Unserved
Date: November 10, 2020eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: July 14, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: December 04, 2020Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage
Date: December 09, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: December 09, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 09, 2020Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: December 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing
Date: December 15, 2020Notice of Action
Date: December 15, 2020Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: December 15, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: February 24, 2021Motion for Default & Default
Date: March 19, 2021Non-Military Affidavit
Date: March 19, 2021Affidavit in Support
Date: March 03, 2021Foreclosure Form
Date: March 19, 2021Final Disposition Form - Disposed By Judge
Date: March 19, 2021Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: April 02, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: April 29, 2021Motion to Vacate Final Judgment
Date: May 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating Judgment Vol./Book 0 , Page 0, 2 pages Instrument Number 117311084 |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Partners For Payment Relief De IV LLC |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney June 1, 2021 |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment of Foreclosure Vol./Book 0 , Page 0, 6 pages Instrument Number 117156306 |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Default | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default against Defendant(s) VICTORIA LOPEZParty: Plaintiff Partners For Payment Relief De IV LLC |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Party: Plaintiff Partners For Payment Relief De IV LLC |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Foreclosure Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.