Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rodriguez, Fausto, Rodriguez, Teresa, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bernstein, John Stat, against Tower Hill Select Insurance Company, represented by Wolf, Jason B, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by the plaintiffs, Fausto Rodriguez and Teresa Rodriguez, against the defendant, Tower Hill Select Insurance Company, for breach of contract. The plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida and own a property located a...
Request for Production
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: December 19, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: January 10, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 21, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process
Date: January 02, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: January 21, 2020Joint Stipulation
Date: May 05, 2020Notice of Service
Date: February 18, 2020Notice of Compliance
Date: January 10, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Tower Hill Select Insurance Company |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Fausto Plaintiff Rodriguez, Teresa |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Tower Hill Select Insurance Company |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Fausto Plaintiff Rodriguez, Teresa |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Fausto Plaintiff Rodriguez, Teresa |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Party: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Fausto Plaintiff Rodriguez, Teresa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.