Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Meagan Bradley Plaintiff vs. Safepoint Insurance Company Defendant
On December 02, 2019 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 02, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Meagan Bradley against Safepoint Insurance Company. The complaint alleges damages in excess of $15,000. Meagan Bradley was insured by Safepoint Insurance Company under a policy agreement for her property located at 813 …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Cancellation
Date: Mar 25, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: Mar 24, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Mar 16, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Mar 16, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Mar 02, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 20, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: Feb 20, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Jan 24, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jan 22, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 02, 2020Request for Production
Date: Dec 02, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: Dec 02, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: Dec 02, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Dec 02, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Dec 02, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Dec 02, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss ComplaintParty: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Plaintiff Bradley, Meagan |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION .516(b)(1)(A)Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Production To DefendantParty: Plaintiff Bradley, Meagan |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions First to DefendantParty: Plaintiff Bradley, Meagan |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance To Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) For DamagesParty: Plaintiff Bradley, Meagan |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs First Set to DefendantParty: Plaintiff Bradley, Meagan |