Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ordonez, Doreen B, Ordonez, Mitchelle R, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Brito, Gisel, Lee, Robert J, Limia, Dalyz, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Blanco, Jacob Peter, Colville, George Cameron, Williams, Verhonda, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Garcia-Wood, Marina presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Order Granting Motion
Date: February 10, 2023Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: July 07, 2022Order
Date: July 11, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: July 28, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 01, 2022Order
Date: July 05, 2022Answer to Interrogs
Date: July 28, 2022Notice of Charging Lien
Date: July 28, 2022Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 28, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: August 17, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: September 23, 2022Order
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: August 17, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: September 19, 2022Motion
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 19, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 17, 2022Notice of Limited Appearance
Date: July 07, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: July 22, 2022Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 29, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 07, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: September 23, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: October 03, 2022Ex Parte Motion
Date: October 05, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 31, 2022Notice of Withdrawal
Date: November 16, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 12, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: October 11, 2022Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: September 26, 2022Order Denying Motion
Date: February 09, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: September 30, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 31, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: December 19, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 23, 2022Order
Date: February 01, 2023Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: February 24, 2023Agreed Order
Date: November 30, 2022Response to Motion
Date: November 23, 2022Directions to the Clerk
Date: November 08, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: November 17, 2022Notice of Limited Appearance
Date: November 30, 2022Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: December 05, 2022Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: November 30, 2022Amended
Date: December 17, 2022Order of Reassignment
Date: February 08, 2023Motion to Strike Expert Witness
Date: March 20, 2023Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: May 10, 2023Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: March 14, 2023Order On Case Management Conference
Date: March 07, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 01, 2023Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 14, 2023Subpoena Returned Served
Date: March 16, 2023Motion in Limine
Date: July 19, 2023Notice of Service
Date: May 25, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 19, 2023Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: May 22, 2023Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 07, 2023Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: May 10, 2023Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 17, 2023Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: May 22, 2023Notice of Unavailability
Date: July 24, 2023Amended
Date: September 12, 2023Witness List
Date: August 19, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: August 26, 2021Notice
Date: September 07, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: August 26, 2021Mediation Report
Date: September 09, 2021Amended
Date: September 20, 2021Notice to Show Cause
Date: September 23, 2021Subpoena Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: September 30, 2021Subpoena Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Unserved
Date: October 04, 2021Witness & Exhibit List
Date: October 15, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: October 13, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 22, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: October 22, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: October 25, 2021Notice
Date: October 29, 2021Response
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 29, 2021Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: November 03, 2021Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: November 10, 2021Subpoena Filed
Date: November 11, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: November 12, 2021Request for Production
Date: November 12, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: November 18, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 19, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: November 19, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: November 29, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: December 02, 2021Request for Copies
Date: December 03, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: December 13, 2021Subpoena for Trial Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: December 14, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: December 15, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: December 15, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: December 15, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: December 15, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: December 15, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: December 15, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: December 15, 2021Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: December 15, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: December 21, 2021Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: December 21, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: January 06, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: January 06, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 12, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: January 12, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: January 14, 2022Response to Motion
Date: January 25, 2022Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: January 26, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 27, 2022Order
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: February 03, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: February 07, 2022Motion for Rule to Show Cause
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: February 10, 2022Request
Date: February 11, 2022Request
Date: February 11, 2022Request for Copies
Date: February 11, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: February 23, 2022Motion for Rule to Show Cause
Date: February 11, 2022Motion
Date: February 28, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 03, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: March 08, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 03, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: March 08, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 08, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 08, 2022Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: March 14, 2022Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 15, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: March 15, 2022Amended Witness List
Date: March 16, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: March 18, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 21, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: March 22, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: March 22, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 22, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 25, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: March 30, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 30, 2022Order to Compel
Date: March 30, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: March 30, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: March 31, 2022Subpoena Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Subpoena for Trial
Date: April 01, 2022Subpoena Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Subpoena Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Subpoena Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: April 01, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: April 01, 2022Request for Copies
Date: April 01, 2022Cross Notice
Date: April 01, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: April 02, 2022Motion for Rule to Show Cause
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: April 07, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: April 07, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: April 07, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: April 07, 2022Response to Motion
Date: April 08, 2022Request for Production
Date: October 15, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 15, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: October 15, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served
Date: October 28, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: November 04, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: November 15, 2019Answer
Date: December 10, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 10, 2019Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 20, 2019Request to Produce
Date: January 03, 2020Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 03, 2020Notice of Compliance
Date: January 03, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: January 06, 2020Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 12, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 04, 2020Order
Date: February 18, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 10, 2020Order Extending Time
Date: March 06, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: March 10, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 26, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 26, 2020Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 22, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: May 27, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: July 31, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: July 31, 2020Motion
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: November 12, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: November 30, 2020Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: March 01, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 09, 2021Notice of Change of Address
Date: March 11, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 15, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 29, 2021Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: May 26, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Unserved
Date: June 01, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 10, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: June 15, 2021Order Denying Motion to Strike
Date: July 01, 2021Expert Witness List
Date: July 24, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended NOTICE OF APPEARANCEParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Party: Plaintiff Ordonez, Doreen B Plaintiff Ordonez, Mitchelle R |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Supplemental Response - Request for Production | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Supplemental Request to Produce | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order CONCERING UNILATERALLY SET DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S EXPERTParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served BRANDON SWANSON C/O CORAL GABLES PLUMBING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.