Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Suntrust Bank, Truist Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Storey, Philip D, against Burns, Jason, Burns, Maribel, represented by Rumore, C Anthony, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Garcia-Wood, Marina presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
eSummons Issuance
Date: October 15, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: October 15, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: October 15, 2019Value Claim Form
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: October 15, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: October 15, 2019Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: January 29, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 17, 2020Appearance As Attorney of Record
Date: July 06, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: October 22, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: August 13, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 26, 2019Joint Motion
Date: July 14, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: October 25, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 13, 2020Witness & Exhibit List
Date: July 09, 2021Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: October 28, 2021Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 11, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: January 29, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 17, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 01, 2021Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff
Date: July 01, 2021Motion for Substitution of Party(S)
Date: May 10, 2021Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: March 06, 2020Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: February 11, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 17, 2022Affidavit of Compliance
Date: October 22, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: March 18, 2020Summons Returned Unserved
Date: November 25, 2019Ord Canceling/Rescheduling Clerk's Fclsre Sale
Date: February 16, 2022Summons Returned Unserved
Date: December 11, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 20, 2020Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 04, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: November 12, 2021Order Setting
Date: May 05, 2021Final Disposition Form - Disposed By Judge
Date: October 22, 2021Order Setting
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: February 17, 2022Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: March 23, 2022Motion for Default
Date: January 14, 2020Notice of Withdrawal
Date: March 17, 2020Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 25, 2020Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: February 11, 2022Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: January 29, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Cancelled |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, DISMISS ACTION AND FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTEParty: Plaintiff Truist Bank |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
February 22, 2022 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney April 20, 2022 |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Ord Canceling/Rescheduling Clerk's Fclsre Sale | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale Party: Defendant Burns, Jason Defendant Burns, Maribel |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale Party: Defendant Burns, Maribel Defendant Burns, Jason |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.