Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Crespo, Marcelo, Yllescas, Norma M, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Alvarez, Jamie, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Williams, Verhonda, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Notice of Appearance
Date: April 27, 2020Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: October 15, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: January 14, 2020Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 03, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Interrogatories
Date: October 15, 2019Request for Production
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: October 15, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: November 08, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: December 23, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 21, 2019Request for Production
Date: January 03, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 28, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Ashley Joseph, EsqParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Crespo, Marcelo Plaintiff Yllescas, Norma M |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR SANCTIONSParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
December 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: SHIELD LAW GROUP OF FLORIDA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A189470; ;Amount: $401.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.