Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Delossantos, Nilo V, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dominguez, Robert, against Jp Morgan Chase Bank Na, Steiner, Hal M, represented by Tamarazzo, Dominick V, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Nilo V. Delossantos against Hal M. Steiner and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. The complaint seeks damages exceeding $15,000. Nilo V. Delossantos is a permanent resident of Broward County, Florida, as is Hal M. Steiner. JP Morga...
eSummons Issuance
Date: October 24, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: November 12, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: October 24, 2019Reply to Answer
Date: November 26, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: November 27, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: November 26, 2019Request for Production
Date: November 27, 2019Joint Stipulation
Date: April 02, 2020Notice of Firm Name Change
Date: February 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change Party: Plaintiff Delossantos, Nilo V |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Reply to Answer | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Reply to Answer | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer & Affirmative Defenses | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer & Affirmative Defenses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.