Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gabriel , Irene, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Baldwin, Angelia, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Williams, Verhonda, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2019Request for Production
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: October 15, 2019Request to Produce
Date: December 24, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: October 28, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: November 18, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 25, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 24, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: December 24, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: January 21, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 20, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 23, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 21, 2020Answer & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: April 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer & Demand for Jury Trial Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce TO PLAINTIFFParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.