Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ali, Ovais, Arif, Adeel, Beliukov, Denis, Cole, Travis, Ilawan, Elizabeth, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Dagen, Alan, against Arif, Sdel, Haider, Ovais, Iiawan, Elizabeth, Israel, Yvenson, Vince Ecom Empire Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Grant, Joe M, Grant, Joey Michael, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePerlman, Sandra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2019 |
CategoryFraud |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by plaintiffs Ovais Haider Ali and Travis Cole against defendants Vince Ecom Empire LLC and Yvenson Israel. The plaintiffs allege that Vince, a dissolved corporation, and Israel, an individual, made false representations and e...
Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 27, 2020Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 29, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: November 15, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: October 18, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: November 15, 2019Notice of Service
Date: November 19, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: July 20, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 03, 2021Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part
Date: February 26, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 15, 2021Request for Production
Date: January 15, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: October 07, 2019Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 24, 2020Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 20, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 29, 2021Answer to Counterclaim
Date: July 25, 2020Request for Production
Date: April 07, 2020Second Amended Complaint
Date: March 16, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: September 15, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: September 14, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: March 25, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: September 09, 2020Request for Admissions
Date: September 28, 2020Notice of Firm Name Change
Date: March 25, 2021Interrogatories
Date: April 07, 2020Complaint (eFiled)
Date: October 07, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 25, 2020Order Extending Time
Date: May 05, 2020Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 04, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: October 23, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: October 07, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 13, 2019Motion to Transfer & Consolidate
Date: August 13, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: May 25, 2020Third Amended Complaint
Date: May 07, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: January 06, 2020Order
Date: February 20, 2020Memorandum in Opposition
Date: February 19, 2020Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim
Date: June 24, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: October 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer & Consolidate AND CONSOLIDATEParty: Defendant Israel, Yvenson Defendant Vince Ecom Empire LLC |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Defendant Israel, Yvenson Defendant Vince Ecom Empire LLC |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change Party: Defendant Israel, Yvenson Defendant Vince Ecom Empire LLC |
|
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Israel, Yvenson Defendant Vince Ecom Empire LLC |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.