Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Allen, Antone James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lessmann, Bennett, against Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Stanley, Jennifer, represented by Meyer, Julie, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Antone James Allen against Jennifer Stanley and Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Jennifer Stanley and Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company in a ca...
Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 06, 2018Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: February 13, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 14, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 14, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 14, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 08, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 08, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served Party: Plaintiff Allen, Antone James |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance JULIE M. MEYER FL Bar No. 041177Party: Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.