Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lotane, Troy R, Lotane, Troy R, Esq., against Francoeur, Ernest, represented by Noble, Kenneth R, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, on behalf of Martha H Ryals Revocable Living Trust, Martha H Ryals, and Lloyd Hicks, against Ernest Francoeur. The complaint alleges that on January 16, 2016, Francoeur neglig...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 29, 2018Agreed Order Granting
Date: August 15, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 04, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: March 26, 2019Settlement Agreement
Date: June 18, 2019Motion to Vacate Final Judgment
Date: March 24, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 19, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: March 02, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 26, 2018Request to Produce
Date: May 24, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 24, 2018Motion for Mediation
Date: October 08, 2018Certificate
Date: June 10, 2019Affidavit
Date: February 24, 2021Motion for Entry
Date: February 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF DEFAULT IN STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTParty: Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry OF FINAL JUDGMENT BASED ON DEFAULT IN STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTParty: Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITYParty: Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion REQUESTING COURT ORDERED MEDIATION |
|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation Party: Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.