Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Swaby, Shambaula, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Wolfson, Jonah M, against Melohn, Annette, represented by Diaz, Julio L, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Shambaula Swaby, is suing the defendant, Annette Melomn, for damages exceeding $15,000. The complaint alleges neglig...
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 16, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: March 16, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: May 03, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 19, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 21, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 22, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Jury Trial
Date: August 22, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 05, 2018Request for Physical Examination
Date: January 09, 2019Request to Produce
Date: January 26, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 26, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 16, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 22, 2018Request for Copies
Date: August 22, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 22, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Physical Examination Party: Defendant Melohn, Annette |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery Party: Plaintiff Swaby, Shambaula |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Trial / THAT MATTER IS AT ISSUE AND READYParty: Plaintiff Swaby, Shambaula |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.