Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Durocher, Elena Anne, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nicastro, Eric William, Esq., against Progressive Select Insurance Company, represented by Eisenberg, Tiffany, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Elena Anne Durocher against Progressive Select Insurance Company. The complaint alleges damages that exceed $15,000 and invokes the subject matter jurisdiction of the court. Elena Anne Durocher is a resident of Broward Coun...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 15, 2018Request to Produce
Date: March 02, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 02, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 02, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 24, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 25, 2018Motion to Quash
Date: May 04, 2018Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: April 24, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 26, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 16, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE CREATED FOR ORIGINAL DOCS |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM served |
|
May 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash Party: Plaintiff Durocher, Elena Anne |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.