Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Holding, Elsie, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Dumenigo, Federico Alberto, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Brant, Todd E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Elsie Holding against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and reasonable attorneys' fees. Elsie Holding is an individual over ...
Request for Admissions
Date: February 28, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: February 06, 2018Notice of Service
Date: February 28, 2018Request to Produce
Date: February 28, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Holding, Elsie |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTParty: Plaintiff Holding, Elsie |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff Holding, Elsie |
|
February 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Todd E. Brant, Esq. Fla. Bar No. 0179310Party: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: FRANK HERNANDEZ JR. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A018760; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: FRANK HERNANDEZ JR. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A013419; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Holding, Elsie |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.