Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rose-Firich, Rachel, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Reynolds, Robert A., Esq., against Monarch National Insurance Company, represented by Buchanan, Deidrie A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Rachel Rose-Firich against Monarch National Insurance Company. The plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The plaintiff alleges that they had an insurance policy with the defendant, insuring their property locat...
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 09, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 29, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: April 24, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 05, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Monarch National Insurance Company |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint FOR DAMAGESParty: Plaintiff Rose-Firich, Rachel |
|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order FOR MOTION FOR EXTFNSION |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Monarch National Insurance Company |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Monarch National Insurance Company |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance DEIDRIE A. BUCHANAN, ESQUIRE FL Bar No.: 32668Party: Defendant Monarch National Insurance Company |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses ROBERT A. REYNOLDSParty: Plaintiff Rose-Firich, Rachel |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance MONARCH NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR DAMAGESParty: Plaintiff Rose-Firich, Rachel |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions TO MONARCH NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANYParty: Plaintiff Rose-Firich, Rachel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.