Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
High Line Planning Llc, Lazzaro, John, Schuk, Chad, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Vine, S Jonathan, against Madden, Patrick, represented by Patricios, Leon Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by HIGH LINE PLANNING, LLC, CHAD SCHUK, and JOHN LAZZARO against PATRICK MADDEN. The complaint alleges that Madden, who is the Operating Manager of HIGH LINE, has engaged in misconduct and breached his duties, causing financia...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service
Date: March 23, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 28, 2018Memorandum in Opposition
Date: April 05, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 28, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: April 13, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: April 23, 2018Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: May 04, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Service
Date: May 14, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: July 02, 2018Objection
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: August 14, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: July 23, 2018Request for Production
Date: July 23, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: August 01, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 03, 2018Reply
Date: July 18, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: July 26, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 08, 2018Motion
Date: August 29, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: October 19, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: October 18, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: November 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 10, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 21, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: February 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 05, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: May 10, 2018Response
Date: May 14, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: June 27, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: June 29, 2018Motion for Mediation
Date: July 17, 2018Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 19, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 19, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 30, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: August 06, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: August 28, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: August 30, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: October 11, 2018Motion
Date: October 12, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 19, 2018Notice
Date: November 07, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 07, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: October 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant Madden, Patrick |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' NON-PARTY SUBPOENA DUCES TECUMParty: Defendant Madden, Patrick |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Schuk, Chad |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Plaintiff Schuk, Chad |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents / SECOND / AND THINGS TO DEFENDANTParty: Plaintiff High Line Planning LLC Plaintiff Schuk, Chad Plaintiff Lazzaro, John |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUMParty: Plaintiff High Line Planning LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.