Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Alvarez, Barbara, Corral, Anthony, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Duboff, Kenneth, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Brant, Todd E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Anthony Corral and Barbara Alvarez against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida, and the defendant...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 09, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 18, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 29, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 29, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 20, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 13, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 04, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 07, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 07, 2018Privilege Log
Date: May 11, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 29, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 31, 2018Agreed Order
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order That the Defendant's extension request is GRANTED |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO SERVE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALParty: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.